U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40055-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 21, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 21, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • August 21, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 08, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 08, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 08, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 03, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 21, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • June 21, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.