U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40054-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Harden
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 14, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 14, 2025: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • August 22, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 13, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 09, 2022: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 08, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • February 25, 2022: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 24, 2022: [Consent]
  • February 24, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • February 24, 2022: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • February 24, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • February 24, 2022: [Arraignment]
  • February 24, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
May, 2021
  • May 13, 2021: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • May 13, 2021: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
December, 2018
  • December 17, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • November 14, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • October 16, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • October 15, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • October 15, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 09, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 09, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 09, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 19, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 10, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 21, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 21, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 20, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 13, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 13, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • August 13, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 10, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • August 08, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2018
  • July 30, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 30, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 30, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 30, 2018: [Letter]
  • July 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 23, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 19, 2018: [Sealed Evaluation]
  • July 16, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • July 06, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • July 05, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 05, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 25, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 25, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • May 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 23, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 23, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 23, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 22, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 21, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 18, 2018: [Continue]
  • May 01, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 01, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 26, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 23, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 23, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 23, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 23, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 18, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 17, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 17, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • April 16, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • April 16, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • April 16, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
March, 2018
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • March 21, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 21, 2018: [Bond Hearing]
  • March 20, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • March 09, 2018: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 08, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • March 08, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • March 08, 2018: [Reconsideration]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 22, 2018: [Letter]
  • February 21, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • February 15, 2018: [Discovery]
  • February 14, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • February 14, 2018: [Stipulation]
  • February 14, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • February 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 09, 2018: [Continue]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 25, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 24, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 24, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 24, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 24, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 24, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 24, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 24, 2018: [Discovery]
  • January 23, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 23, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 22, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • January 17, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • January 12, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 12, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • January 12, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 12, 2018: [Arrest]
  • January 12, 2018: [Bail Report]
  • January 11, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2018: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • January 10, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • January 09, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • January 09, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
December, 2017
  • December 15, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 13, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 07, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 10, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 10, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 28, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 28, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 28, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • September 28, 2017: [Bond Hearing]
  • September 28, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 27, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 26, 2017: [Reconsideration]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 07, 2017: [Discovery]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 23, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 22, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 17, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 17, 2017: [Response]
  • August 17, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2017: [Response]
  • August 15, 2017: [Request]
  • August 11, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • August 10, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 10, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 09, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • August 09, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 07, 2017: [Discovery]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 28, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • June 27, 2017: [Request]
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 20, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • June 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 20, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 20, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 19, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.