U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50101-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Blacksmith
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Appeal Record Returned]
  • August 11, 2022: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 21, 2022: [USCA Opinion]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 28, 2021: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 27, 2021: [Transcript]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • July 06, 2021: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • July 06, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • June 24, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 24, 2021: [Forfeiture]
  • June 24, 2021: [Sentencing]
  • June 22, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2021: [Status Conference]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Sealed Response to Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • May 13, 2021: [Sealed Supporting Document(s) Related to Sentencing]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2021
  • March 24, 2021: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
November, 2020
  • November 20, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 18, 2020: [Text Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
August, 2020
  • August 27, 2020: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • August 27, 2020: [Leave to]
May, 2020
  • May 27, 2020: [Declaration of Publication]
  • May 11, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 11, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 11, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2020
  • April 23, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • April 20, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 20, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 16, 2020: [Order]
  • April 09, 2020: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • April 08, 2020: [Forfeiture]
  • April 06, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 10, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
  • February 06, 2020: [Verdict]
  • February 06, 2020: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • February 06, 2020: [Jury Question]
  • February 06, 2020: [Order]
  • February 06, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 06, 2020: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • February 06, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • February 05, 2020: [Jury Trial - Continuation]
  • February 05, 2020: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • February 04, 2020: [Jury Instructions]
  • February 04, 2020: [Jury List]
  • February 04, 2020: [Jury Trial - Began]
January, 2020
  • January 30, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 29, 2020: [Order]
  • January 29, 2020: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 27, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 22, 2020: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • January 21, 2020: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • January 10, 2020: [Notice]
  • January 09, 2020: [Notice]
December, 2019
  • December 20, 2019: [Order on Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 19, 2019: [Stipulation for Entry of Standing Discovery Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
October, 2019
  • October 24, 2019: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • October 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2019: [Terminate Hearings]
  • October 23, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 23, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • October 17, 2019: [Brief]
  • October 17, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 14, 2019: [Notice]
  • October 11, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • October 09, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 09, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • October 09, 2019: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • October 08, 2019: [Extend]
  • October 08, 2019: [Indictment - Superseding]
September, 2019
  • September 26, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 25, 2019: [Notice]
July, 2019
  • July 08, 2019: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
June, 2019
  • June 24, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 21, 2019: [Continue]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 03, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 19, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2018
  • December 03, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 28, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2018
  • October 26, 2018: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges]
  • October 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 22, 2018: [Extend]
  • October 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • October 12, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • April 19, 2018: [CJA 24 - Authorization to Pay]
  • April 16, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Official Transcript]
  • April 16, 2018: [Transcript]
  • April 10, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • February 14, 2018: [Exhibit List]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 17, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 16, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 15, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • November 08, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • November 07, 2017: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 07, 2017: [Redacted Document]
  • November 03, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 03, 2017: [Suppress]
  • November 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Extend]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • September 18, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • September 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • September 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 18, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • September 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • September 11, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.