U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50100-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cummings
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2019
  • September 10, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • October 04, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • September 29, 2017: [Receipt for Payment]
  • September 29, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • September 21, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • September 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 15, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • September 01, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • August 08, 2017: [Indictment]
  • August 04, 2017: [Order]
  • August 04, 2017: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • August 04, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • July 21, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • July 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 20, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 20, 2017: [Discovery]
  • July 11, 2017: [Response]
  • July 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2017: [Request]
  • July 07, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 07, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 07, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 07, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2017: [Arraignment]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
  • June 20, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.