U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50099-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bad Wound
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order re Exhibits]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Judgment and Commitment/Statement of Reasons]
  • December 07, 2020: [Sentencing]
November, 2020
  • November 30, 2020: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 30, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
July, 2020
  • July 24, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 24, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • July 24, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2020
  • May 28, 2020: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • May 28, 2020: [Continue]
April, 2020
  • April 28, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 28, 2020: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • April 16, 2020: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 09, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2020
  • February 20, 2020: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 14, 2020: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 14, 2020: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 14, 2020: [Consent]
  • February 11, 2020: [Request]
January, 2020
  • January 28, 2020: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • January 28, 2020: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 28, 2020: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 28, 2020: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 16, 2020: [Order]
  • January 06, 2020: [Pretrial Conference]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Jury List]
  • January 03, 2020: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 02, 2020: [Jury List]
  • January 02, 2020: [Exclude]
  • January 02, 2020: [Notice]
December, 2019
  • December 27, 2019: [Response to Motion]
  • December 21, 2019: [Notice]
  • December 20, 2019: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • December 20, 2019: [Notice]
August, 2019
  • August 29, 2019: [Consent]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 20, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 20, 2019: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • August 15, 2019: [Continue]
  • August 15, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2019: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • August 15, 2019: [In Limine]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 14, 2019: [Consent]
  • May 09, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 06, 2019: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • February 22, 2019: [Order on Report and Recommendations]
January, 2019
  • January 10, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
November, 2018
  • November 28, 2018: [Brief]
  • November 21, 2018: [Brief]
  • November 19, 2018: [Oral Order]
  • November 15, 2018: [Transcript]
  • November 05, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • November 01, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 15, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • October 11, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2018
  • August 15, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 15, 2018: [Continue]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 16, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Order Referring Motion]
  • June 18, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 18, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • June 12, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 11, 2018: [Extend]
  • June 04, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Leave to]
  • June 04, 2018: [Request]
  • June 04, 2018: [Suppress]
  • June 04, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 04, 2018: [Leave to]
  • June 04, 2018: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • June 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
March, 2018
  • March 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • March 12, 2018: [Request]
  • March 12, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
February, 2018
  • February 13, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2017: [Request]
  • December 21, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 30, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 18, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 05, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 04, 2017: [Request]
  • October 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 03, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 02, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 02, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 02, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • October 02, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 02, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 02, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 02, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • October 02, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • October 02, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 29, 2017: [Arrest]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.