U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
May, 2021
  • May 10, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
October, 2019
  • October 03, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
August, 2019
  • August 16, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • August 16, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • July 19, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • July 19, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • July 19, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • July 02, 2018: [Transmittal of Subsequent Filing to 8th Circuit COA]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • June 29, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • June 29, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 29, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 29, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • June 29, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • June 29, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 19, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 18, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 15, 2018: [Sealed Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • June 11, 2018: [Evaluation]
  • June 11, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 11, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 04, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
May, 2018
  • May 02, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
April, 2018
  • April 24, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • April 24, 2018: [Extend]
  • April 11, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 09, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • February 22, 2018: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • February 22, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 09, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 09, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 09, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 07, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • February 07, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • February 05, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 05, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 05, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 16, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 16, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 18, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 18, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Order]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • July 26, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order]
  • July 24, 2017: [Exhibit List]
  • July 24, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • July 24, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • July 14, 2017: [For Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Request]
  • July 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 11, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 11, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 10, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 10, 2017: [Arrest]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 20, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.