U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stabler
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 29, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 29, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 22, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 22, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 22, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 11, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2018: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
  • May 07, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 09, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 09, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 09, 2018: [Waiver]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 08, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 08, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 08, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 08, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 31, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 31, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 16, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 04, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 05, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 05, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 01, 2017: [Continue]
August, 2017
  • August 01, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 21, 2017: [Request]
  • July 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 03, 2017: [Continue]
June, 2017
  • June 20, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.