U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50096-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2018
  • July 19, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2018
  • June 29, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 29, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 29, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 21, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 21, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 21, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 21, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 04, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • February 23, 2018: [Consent]
  • February 23, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 20, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 20, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 20, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 20, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 06, 2018: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • January 26, 2018: [Discovery]
  • January 22, 2018: [Order]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2017
  • August 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 24, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • August 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • July 07, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 30, 2017: [Request]
  • June 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 30, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 29, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 29, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 29, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 29, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 29, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 29, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 29, 2017: [Arrest]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • June 20, 2017: [Indictment]
  • June 20, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.