U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:16-cr-50017-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hutchinson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 19, 2018: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • November 19, 2018: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
July, 2018
  • July 05, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • March 20, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2018
  • February 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 09, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 09, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • February 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 02, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 02, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 02, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • January 17, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 18, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 01, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 01, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • August 25, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • August 25, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • August 25, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 18, 2017: [Request]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 14, 2017: [Consent]
  • July 14, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 14, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 14, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 14, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 14, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 13, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • July 12, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2017
  • June 28, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 21, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.