U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30018
  • Case Name: Virginia Mae Ewen
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
September, 2018
  • September 07, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
December, 2017
  • December 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
November, 2017
  • November 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 17, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Approving Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
  • October 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Support Document]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Deadlines]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Deadline to File Financial Management]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Deadline to File Financial Management (No Notice)]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
  • September 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
August, 2017
  • August 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • August 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
July, 2017
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Extend Time]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objecting to Discharge (Rule 4004)]
  • July 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Mailing List with Notice - Adding Creditors (fee required)]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Debtor(s) Statement Regarding Business Records]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Debtor(s) Declaration Concerning Schedules]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedules A-J]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
June, 2017
  • June 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.