U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30078-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Dolphus et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 21, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2021
  • January 08, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 06, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2020
  • December 22, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 21, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 21, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2020
  • November 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 16, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 12, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 12, 2020: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2020: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 12, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 12, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 12, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 12, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 12, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
August, 2020
  • August 21, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 18, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 17, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 21, 2020: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 20, 2020: [Modify Conditions of Release]
February, 2020
  • February 24, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 24, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 18, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 13, 2020: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 13, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 12, 2020: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 11, 2020: [Continue]
  • February 11, 2020: [Furlough]
  • February 11, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 05, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 03, 2020: [Continue]
January, 2020
  • January 31, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 29, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • January 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 08, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 07, 2020: [Continue]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 18, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 17, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 10, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 27, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 27, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 27, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 27, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • November 27, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • November 27, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 27, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 26, 2019: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • November 25, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 22, 2019: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
May, 2019
  • May 02, 2019: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 03, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 03, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2018
  • December 31, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 19, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 19, 2018: [Order]
  • December 18, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • December 12, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • December 11, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • December 11, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 10, 2018: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 07, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • May 27, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • May 27, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2018
  • April 11, 2018: [Receipt for Return of Exhibits]
  • April 09, 2018: [Order for Return of Exhibit(s)]
March, 2018
  • March 22, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 22, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • March 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 21, 2018: [Extend]
  • March 15, 2018: [Allocution Statement]
  • March 15, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 15, 2018: [Extend]
  • March 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 09, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • February 28, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 13, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • February 06, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • January 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 29, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 22, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 21, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
  • December 21, 2017: [Extend]
  • December 14, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • December 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 11, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • December 07, 2017: [Brief]
  • December 05, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • December 05, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • December 05, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 01, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 01, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Notice]
  • November 29, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • November 29, 2017: [Arrest]
  • November 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 20, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 07, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • November 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 18, 2017: [Furlough]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 13, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: [Furlough]
  • September 28, 2017: [Letter]
  • September 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 26, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 26, 2017: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 25, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 22, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 21, 2017: [Release from Custody]
  • September 19, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 19, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 19, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 14, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2017: [Report of Apparent Violation of Pretrial Release Conditions]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 10, 2017: [Revoke]
  • August 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 04, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 04, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 03, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 11, 2017: [Sealed Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 28, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • June 27, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 27, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • June 24, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 24, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2017: [Request]
  • June 22, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 22, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 22, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 22, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • June 22, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 22, 2017: [Arrest]
  • June 22, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • June 21, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.