U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40270
  • Case Name: Kenneth Eldon Creamer
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 25, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 15, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • July 19, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • July 09, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 07, 2022: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 21, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
July, 2017
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • June 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Service of Tax Information to Requestor]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Employee Income Records]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.