U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50140
  • Case Name: Benny Eugene Page, Jr. and Candace Lynn Page
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
September, 2020
  • September 09, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 23, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Request for Certified Copy]
May, 2019
  • May 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
April, 2019
  • April 24, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 27, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service of TFR (Used only by Ch 7 Trustee)]
  • February 04, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation (Without Notice)]
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Proof of Claim Attachment 3001(c)(1)(d)]
September, 2018
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Clerk's Certificate of Mailing]
  • September 24, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
August, 2018
  • August 22, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement Re: Undeliverable or Returned Mail]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
  • October 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Reaffirmation Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Defer Discharge (Text Order)]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Defer Discharge (Debtors Only)]
  • September 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
August, 2017
  • August 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • August 01, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • July 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Late Notice]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Intention]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedules A-J]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Mailing List with Notice - Adding Creditors (fee required)]
June, 2017
  • June 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.