U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-10031-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Reeds et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 07, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 07, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • May 17, 2021: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 10, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 20, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • April 07, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • April 01, 2021: [Furlough]
March, 2021
  • March 31, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • March 31, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • March 31, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • March 31, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • March 31, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 31, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • March 30, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2018
  • November 14, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 14, 2018: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 14, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 06, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2018
  • October 25, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 25, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 10, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 18, 2018: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 17, 2018: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • September 14, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 14, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 14, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2018
  • February 01, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2017: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2017
  • August 21, 2017: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 17, 2017: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 02, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 20, 2017: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 20, 2017: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 11, 2017: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • July 07, 2017: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2017
  • June 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 23, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 23, 2017: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • June 23, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 23, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • June 23, 2017: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 23, 2017: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.