U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:10-cr-30069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Fire Cloud
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [Order on Request for Termination of Supervision]
  • July 22, 2019: [Motion Hearing]
June, 2019
  • June 18, 2019: [Objection]
  • June 18, 2019: [Request for Termination of Supervision]
August, 2018
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 22, 2018: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 22, 2018: [Request]
  • August 17, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • August 10, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2017
  • June 27, 2017: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.