U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gassman
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Transcript]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 04, 2022: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • February 03, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 03, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 13, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 04, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 28, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 19, 2021: [Furlough]
  • December 13, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2021: [Bail Review Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 08, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 05, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 05, 2021: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • November 05, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 05, 2021: [Bail Review Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 30, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 28, 2021: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • September 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 28, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 27, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 15, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 14, 2021: [Exhibit List]
  • June 14, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • June 14, 2021: [Letter(s) of Support (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 11, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • June 08, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2021
  • May 25, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 27, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 22, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • April 22, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 22, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • April 22, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • April 22, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 22, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 20, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 20, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • April 19, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
August, 2020
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
July, 2020
  • July 15, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2020
  • June 02, 2020: [Sealed Trial/Hearing Exhibits]
  • June 02, 2020: [Exhibit List]
  • June 01, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 01, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 01, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2019
  • October 15, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 11, 2019: [Furlough]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 30, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • September 27, 2019: [Furlough]
  • September 25, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 17, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 17, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • September 11, 2019: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • September 04, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 20, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 08, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • August 08, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 30, 2019: [Furlough]
  • July 10, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • July 09, 2019: [Furlough]
  • July 02, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2019
  • June 28, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 27, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • June 27, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • June 27, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • June 27, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 06, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • June 06, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 06, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 06, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • June 05, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2019
  • May 03, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 02, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2019
  • March 06, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
May, 2018
  • May 18, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 07, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2018
  • February 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 22, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 22, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 20, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • February 15, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 05, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 01, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
January, 2018
  • January 18, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 01, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 20, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • November 20, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • November 20, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 28, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 25, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 25, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 03, 2017: [Order]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • June 29, 2017: [Request]
  • June 29, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 28, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • June 28, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • June 28, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • June 28, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 28, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 27, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 27, 2017: [Request]
  • June 27, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 27, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 27, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.