U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cv-05053
  • Case Name: Pentecost v. Dooley
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 09, 2018: [Mail Returned]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Judgment]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendation]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Motion to Show Cause]
  • March 28, 2018: [Order on Objection to Report and Recommendation]
February, 2018
  • February 05, 2018: [Letter Received]
December, 2017
  • December 18, 2017: [Notice of Change of Address]
  • December 04, 2017: [Show Cause]
  • December 04, 2017: [Objection to Report and Recommendation]
  • December 04, 2017: [Notice]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 30, 2017: [Extend]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • October 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 19, 2017: [Report and Recommendations]
  • October 10, 2017: [Miscellaneous Submission (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • October 06, 2017: [Received]
September, 2017
  • September 22, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • August 02, 2017: [Response to Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 19, 2017: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • July 19, 2017: [Dismiss]
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 12, 2017: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 29, 2017: [Order]
  • June 28, 2017: [Letter Sent]
  • June 28, 2017: [Letter Received]
  • June 28, 2017: [Stay]
  • June 28, 2017: [Prisoner Trust Account Report]
  • June 28, 2017: [Affidavit in Support]
  • June 28, 2017: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2254) (COURT USE ONLY)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.