U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:99-cr-50001-1
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Loud Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • April 02, 2025: [Supplement]
November, 2019
  • November 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2018
  • November 06, 2018: [28:2255 Motion to Vacate (filed in Civil Case)]
July, 2017
  • July 07, 2017: [Letter]
June, 2017
  • June 29, 2017: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.