U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50148
  • Case Name: Gregory Lee Still, Sr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • January 31, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case (Text Order) Ch 13]
November, 2017
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • September 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Continued/Rescheduled]
  • August 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Affidavit]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Power of Attorney]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Hearing (For Confirmations, Obj to Claims and Withdraw as Atty (LBR 2091-1(b)) ONLY)]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedules A-J]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Late Notice]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Amendment to Mailing List with Notice - Adding Creditors (fee required)]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • July 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
June, 2017
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 30, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.