U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50069-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brewer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2021
  • January 12, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • January 08, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 23, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 19, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 17, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • November 17, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 17, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 17, 2020: [Motion Hearing]
  • November 16, 2020: [Furlough]
September, 2020
  • September 10, 2020: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
February, 2020
  • February 21, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 20, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
December, 2019
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • December 27, 2019: [Withdraw Document]
  • December 27, 2019: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 26, 2019: [Furlough]
  • December 16, 2019: [Order]
November, 2019
  • November 15, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 15, 2019: [Order]
  • November 14, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 07, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 07, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 05, 2019: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 05, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
August, 2019
  • August 23, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • August 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 23, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 23, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 23, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 22, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
August, 2018
  • August 07, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2018
  • July 18, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 18, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 13, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 11, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
June, 2018
  • June 01, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 09, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 08, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 08, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 08, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 30, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 28, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • March 14, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 05, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • January 05, 2018: [Consent]
  • January 05, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • December 29, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 29, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 29, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 21, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 17, 2017: [Consent]
  • November 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 15, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 14, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • November 14, 2017: [Response to Motion]
  • November 06, 2017: [Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
October, 2017
  • October 16, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • October 03, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 02, 2017: [Letter]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 29, 2017: [1 - Ex Parte Document]
  • September 29, 2017: [Motion Hearing]
  • September 29, 2017: [Status Conference]
  • September 26, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney ]
  • September 12, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 12, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 12, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 12, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • July 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 06, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 05, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 05, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 05, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 05, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 05, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 05, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 05, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 05, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 03, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 03, 2017: [Arrest]
  • July 03, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.