U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30020
  • Case Name: Jeremy Darrell Schultz and Jennifer Lynn Schultz
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2019
  • October 02, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
September, 2019
  • September 30, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Closing Case]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt/Acct-Asset]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Trustee's Report of Small Dividends/Unclaimed Funds]
November, 2018
  • November 11, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 09, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Allowing Administrative Expense (Text Order)]
October, 2018
  • October 17, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
  • October 15, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Final Rpt & Applications for Compensation]
March, 2018
  • March 04, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Recovery of Assets]
February, 2018
  • February 10, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
  • January 18, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Objection to Debtor(s) Claim of Exemptions]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Withdrawal of Document]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amended Schedules or Statements with Notice (Court)]
December, 2017
  • December 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
November, 2017
  • November 23, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Hearing]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Response]
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Turnover of Property from Debtor]
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employment of Attorney]
  • November 02, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
September, 2017
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • September 01, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Amendment to Schedules or Statements with Notice (Court)]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Employee Income Records]
  • July 05, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • July 04, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deficiency Deadline(s)]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • July 03, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.