U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40063-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cardwell
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • May 07, 2025: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • May 07, 2025: [Clerk's Notice of Activating CJA Privileges (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • May 06, 2025: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • May 05, 2025: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2018
  • September 04, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2018
  • June 19, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 19, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 11, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • June 11, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 11, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 11, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • June 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • May 22, 2018: [Amend/Correct]
  • May 17, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 16, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • May 10, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 03, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 29, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 29, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • March 29, 2018: [Arraignment]
  • March 29, 2018: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • March 29, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • March 28, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 28, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 28, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • March 28, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • March 09, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • March 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • March 03, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 26, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 26, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • February 26, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 22, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • February 16, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 06, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Discovery]
  • December 29, 2017: [Response]
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2017: [Discovery]
  • December 20, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 20, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 15, 2017: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 14, 2017: [Affidavit in Support of Motion]
  • December 14, 2017: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 13, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • December 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • December 11, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • December 11, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • December 06, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 05, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • October 20, 2017: [Discovery]
  • October 16, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • October 12, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • October 11, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • October 11, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • October 11, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • October 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 22, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 15, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 15, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • September 15, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2017: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
  • September 14, 2017: [Arrest - Other District]
  • September 07, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • September 06, 2017: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • September 06, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • August 24, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 24, 2017: [Discovery]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Response]
  • July 21, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 21, 2017: [Request]
  • July 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 18, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • July 18, 2017: [Arrest]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 18, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 18, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 13, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 13, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 06, 2017: [Indictment]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.