U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40062-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reuer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2018
  • October 01, 2018: [Judgment Returned Executed]
August, 2018
  • August 28, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 27, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • August 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • August 27, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • August 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • August 27, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • August 22, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 20, 2018: [Extend]
  • August 20, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • August 20, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
July, 2018
  • July 28, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • July 27, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
  • July 23, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • June 04, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • June 01, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • June 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • May 30, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • May 29, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • May 29, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • May 29, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • May 23, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • May 22, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
March, 2018
  • March 28, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • March 21, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • March 20, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 04, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 17, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 02, 2017: [Discovery]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 02, 2017: [Stipulation]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Response]
  • July 21, 2017: [Request]
  • July 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 18, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 18, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 18, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 18, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 18, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 12, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 12, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 06, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 06, 2017: [Indictment]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.