U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tahsequah
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2020
  • February 27, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • February 25, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • February 19, 2020: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 19, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • February 05, 2020: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2020
  • January 16, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 02, 2020: [Report and Recommendations]
  • January 02, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • January 02, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • January 02, 2020: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • January 02, 2020: [Text Order of Detention]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • December 12, 2019: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 11, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 11, 2019: [Attorney Appointment Hearing]
  • December 11, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 11, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 11, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • December 10, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 09, 2019: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
April, 2018
  • April 06, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
February, 2018
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2018
  • January 23, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 23, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 11, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 02, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2017: [Pre-Sentence Payment]
November, 2017
  • November 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 03, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • November 01, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 31, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 31, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 26, 2017: [Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant Returned Executed]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Request]
  • September 12, 2017: [Search Warrant Issued]
  • September 12, 2017: [Application for Search/Seizure/Tracking Device Warrant]
  • September 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 01, 2017: [Waiver of Speedy Trial]
  • September 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Order]
  • August 30, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • August 25, 2017: [Request]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 17, 2017: [Request]
  • July 17, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 11, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 11, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 10, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 10, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 10, 2017: [Request]
  • July 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 10, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 10, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 06, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.