U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40057-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Archambeau
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
February, 2019
  • February 19, 2019: [Transcript - Redacted]
January, 2019
  • January 16, 2019: [Transcript Redaction Request]
December, 2018
  • December 26, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 26, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • December 22, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • December 22, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
November, 2018
  • November 27, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 27, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 27, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • November 27, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • November 27, 2018: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • November 26, 2018: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 26, 2018: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 26, 2018: [Seal Document (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • November 26, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 14, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 14, 2018: [Continue]
  • November 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 09, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 09, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 05, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
October, 2018
  • October 31, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 31, 2018: [Extend]
  • October 29, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 25, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • October 24, 2018: [Extend]
  • October 15, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2018
  • August 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • August 20, 2018: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 20, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • August 17, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • August 08, 2018: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 03, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • August 03, 2018: [Information - Felony - Superseding]
  • August 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
July, 2018
  • July 11, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 10, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 10, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 10, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
June, 2018
  • June 26, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • June 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • June 12, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
April, 2018
  • April 23, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • April 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • April 10, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 10, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 09, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 07, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 12, 2017: [Brief]
  • July 11, 2017: [Response]
  • July 11, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2017: [Request]
  • July 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 07, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 07, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 07, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 07, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 07, 2017: [Arrest]
  • July 06, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 06, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • July 06, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 06, 2017: [Indictment]
  • July 06, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.