U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40059-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Seke
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2018
  • September 17, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • September 11, 2018: [Forfeiture]
August, 2018
  • August 16, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [Judgment - Amended]
  • February 08, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 22, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 19, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 09, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 09, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 19, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • December 19, 2017: [Forfeiture]
  • December 15, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 23, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 23, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 23, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 23, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 23, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 19, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 03, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • July 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 13, 2017: [Discovery]
  • July 07, 2017: [Oral Order]
  • July 07, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 07, 2017: [Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.