U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40298
  • Case Name: Joseph Gerard Tacke
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • March 26, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
February, 2018
  • February 10, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • February 08, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • February 01, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • January 29, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • January 22, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Joinder]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • January 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • January 02, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • October 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 03, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • August 01, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
July, 2017
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 19, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing]
  • July 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 17, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • July 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Employment of Professional]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Employment of Attorney]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Employee Income Records]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.