U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-01004
  • Case Name: Wampler v. Bond, DDS
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 13, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Close Adversary Case]
September, 2017
  • September 30, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 28, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Dismissing Adversary Proceeding]
  • September 15, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 13, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Show Cause]
August, 2017
  • August 12, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 10, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Clerk's Entry of Default]
July, 2017
  • July 12, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Certificate of Service (Summons & Complaint)]
  • July 10, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Summons Issued]
  • July 10, 2017: ap Office: 1 Chapter: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.