U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30088-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez Chavez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 14, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Order]
  • July 27, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 17, 2017: [Response]
  • July 13, 2017: [Request]
  • July 13, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 11, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 11, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 11, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 11, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 11, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 11, 2017: [Arrest]
  • July 10, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 10, 2017: [Interpreter Needed]
  • July 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 10, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 10, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.