U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:16-cr-40081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lester
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2021
  • March 22, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • March 22, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • March 18, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
January, 2021
  • January 22, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2020
  • December 14, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 10, 2020: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 10, 2020: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 09, 2020: [Continue]
  • December 04, 2020: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • December 04, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2020
  • November 24, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • November 24, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 24, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 24, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 24, 2020: [Consent]
  • November 24, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
July, 2020
  • July 07, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 06, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
June, 2020
  • June 29, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 17, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 17, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • June 17, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 17, 2020: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 17, 2020: [Arraignment]
  • June 17, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • June 17, 2020: [Consent]
  • June 12, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 11, 2020: [Waiver]
  • June 09, 2020: [Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received]
November, 2019
  • November 04, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 01, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
October, 2019
  • October 25, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 23, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • October 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • October 07, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • October 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • October 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 23, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 23, 2019: [Consent]
  • September 23, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • September 23, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 20, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
May, 2018
  • May 09, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • May 09, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • May 09, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 03, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 03, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 03, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 20, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 04, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 15, 2018: [Order for Presentence Study and Report]
  • February 15, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 08, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 08, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 08, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2018
  • January 24, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 23, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 10, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • January 03, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • January 02, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 07, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 19, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • September 19, 2017: [Arrest]
  • September 18, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 18, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • September 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2017
  • August 30, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 13, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 12, 2017: [Request]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 11, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 11, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 10, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 10, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 10, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 10, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 10, 2017: [Bail Report]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.