U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Roubideaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • March 12, 2025: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
September, 2020
  • September 29, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • September 28, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • September 22, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • September 18, 2020: [Final Presentence Report]
  • September 18, 2020: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 16, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • September 08, 2020: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2020
  • August 31, 2020: [Draft Presentence Report]
July, 2020
  • July 20, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 20, 2020: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • July 20, 2020: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 15, 2020: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2020
  • February 10, 2020: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • February 05, 2020: [Furlough]
December, 2019
  • December 18, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • December 18, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • December 18, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 18, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 18, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 18, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 12, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • December 12, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 12, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • December 12, 2019: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 27, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 27, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 24, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 24, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • November 21, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 21, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • November 21, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2017: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • November 07, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 03, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 03, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 13, 2017: [Extend]
  • September 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Order]
  • July 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 24, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 20, 2017: [Arrest]
  • July 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 19, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 19, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 18, 2017: [Request]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2017: [Request]
  • July 11, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 11, 2017: [Indictment]
  • July 11, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.