U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30092-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Farmer
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • October 04, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • October 04, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • September 21, 2021: [Final Presentence Report]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • August 16, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • July 29, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
June, 2021
  • June 02, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • June 02, 2021: [Text Order on Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 02, 2021: [Oral Motion to Waive Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • June 02, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • June 02, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • June 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • June 01, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
December, 2019
  • December 11, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • December 11, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • December 04, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • December 04, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2019
  • November 22, 2019: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney]
  • November 19, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 07, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • November 07, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order of Detention]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order Holding Defendant to Answer Revocation Petition]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 01, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
April, 2019
  • April 17, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 16, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 05, 2019: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 05, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
March, 2019
  • March 05, 2019: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • March 05, 2019: [Scheduling Order]
February, 2019
  • February 27, 2019: [Report and Recommendations]
  • February 27, 2019: [Order]
  • February 27, 2019: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • February 27, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • February 01, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • January 31, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 31, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • January 31, 2019: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 28, 2019: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
November, 2017
  • November 13, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • November 13, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 06, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • November 06, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 18, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 18, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 13, 2017: [Extend]
  • September 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Order]
  • July 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 24, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 20, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 20, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 20, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 20, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 20, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 20, 2017: [Arrest]
  • July 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 19, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 19, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 19, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 18, 2017: [Request]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 18, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2017: [Request]
  • July 11, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 11, 2017: [Indictment]
  • July 11, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.