U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30095-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Scott et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2019
  • June 04, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
March, 2018
  • March 01, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2018
  • January 22, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 22, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 22, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 12, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2017: [Statement of Reasons]
  • December 11, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 11, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • December 05, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 21, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 06, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 30, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 30, 2017: [Waiver of Indictment]
  • October 26, 2017: [Information - Felony]
  • October 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 23, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 23, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 23, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • September 13, 2017: [Extend]
  • September 13, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 13, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 13, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 13, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 01, 2017: [Bail Review Hearing]
  • September 01, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 01, 2017: [Bail Report]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 10, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 10, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
July, 2017
  • July 25, 2017: [Order]
  • July 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 24, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 24, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 24, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 21, 2017: [Request]
  • July 21, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 20, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 20, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 20, 2017: [Disclosure ]
  • July 20, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 20, 2017: [Request]
  • July 20, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 20, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 14, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 11, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 11, 2017: [Indictment]
  • July 11, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.