U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30091-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hacker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2018
  • November 09, 2018: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 08, 2018: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
October, 2018
  • October 30, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error - Probation]
  • October 30, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 30, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 29, 2018: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 29, 2018: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 29, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 19, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • October 19, 2018: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • October 18, 2018: [Furlough]
September, 2018
  • September 27, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • September 27, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order]
  • September 27, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 27, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 27, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 27, 2018: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 27, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 27, 2018: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 27, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
  • September 26, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 26, 2018: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • September 18, 2018: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 18, 2018: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2018
  • April 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 04, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • April 04, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 04, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • April 04, 2018: [Consent to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge]
  • April 03, 2018: [Receipt for Payment]
March, 2018
  • March 14, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 14, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • March 12, 2018: [Sealed Supporting Document(s)]
  • March 09, 2018: [Victim Impact Statement(s)]
  • March 09, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • March 09, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • March 09, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • February 23, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • February 14, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
January, 2018
  • January 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 16, 2018: [Information - Misdemeanor]
  • January 12, 2018: [Terminate Hearings]
  • January 12, 2018: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • January 11, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 11, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 11, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 11, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 08, 2018: [Extend]
November, 2017
  • November 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 06, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 17, 2017: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 11, 2017: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 10, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 06, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 05, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Letter(s) of Support]
August, 2017
  • August 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • July 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order]
  • July 25, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 24, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 24, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 24, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 21, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2017: [Arrest]
  • July 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 21, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 21, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 21, 2017: [Request]
  • July 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 21, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 11, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 11, 2017: [Defendant's Copy of Indictment / Superseding Indictment]
  • July 11, 2017: [Indictment]
  • July 11, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.