U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:17-cr-10024-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cotton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 29, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 29, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • November 16, 2021: [Addendum to Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 02, 2021: [Draft Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 01, 2021: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
October, 2021
  • October 04, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 30, 2021: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 29, 2021: [Report and Recommendations]
  • September 29, 2021: [Revocation Hearing - Preliminary/Other]
  • September 27, 2021: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
  • September 20, 2021: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • September 17, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • September 17, 2021: [Invocation of Rights]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 16, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • September 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • September 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 08, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • June 15, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
January, 2018
  • January 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 04, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2018: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 02, 2018: [Order on Motion for Order]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Proposed Order]
  • December 29, 2017: [For Order]
  • December 11, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 11, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 11, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 27, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 16, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 14, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • September 14, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2017: [Consent]
  • September 11, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 01, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 01, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 01, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
August, 2017
  • August 09, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 09, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 08, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 08, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 18, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 18, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 17, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 17, 2017: [Response]
  • July 14, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 13, 2017: [Request]
  • July 13, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 13, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 13, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 13, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 12, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 12, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • July 12, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 12, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 11, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 11, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 11, 2017: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.