U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-30022
  • Case Name: Daryl Jay Ramquist and Debra Renae Ramquist
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2020
  • January 08, 2020: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
December, 2019
  • December 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
October, 2019
  • October 16, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Application 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • October 15, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • October 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 04, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
September, 2019
  • September 11, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 09, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • September 06, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge (Ch 11/13)]
August, 2019
  • August 28, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 26, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
July, 2019
  • July 01, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification of Financial Management Course]
May, 2019
  • May 24, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
February, 2019
  • February 22, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 20, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver) (fee required)]
January, 2019
  • January 08, 2019: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
August, 2018
  • August 02, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Mortgage Payment Change]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
December, 2017
  • December 19, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • December 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reduced Notice (Shortened Notice)(DO NOT USE re motion to use cash collateral or to obtain credit)]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
October, 2017
  • October 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • September 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auditors Report]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • September 08, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 15, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Selected for Audit]
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 13, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Electronic Notice Registration (Debtor)]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 12, 2017: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.