U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hamer et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 07, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • February 07, 2022: [Transfer Out/Supervised Release]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice to Receiving District of Criminal Case Transfer]
  • January 13, 2022: [Transfer Out/Probationer]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2021: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2018
  • June 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 04, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 04, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • May 24, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • May 24, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 24, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 23, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • May 08, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 25, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 25, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • April 16, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • April 16, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • April 16, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • April 02, 2018: [Letter(s) of Support]
March, 2018
  • March 26, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • March 19, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • March 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 02, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 02, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 02, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 07, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 01, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 01, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
January, 2018
  • January 30, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • January 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 25, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 25, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 25, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • January 04, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
December, 2017
  • December 26, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 11, 2017: [Consent]
October, 2017
  • October 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • October 24, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 13, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • September 13, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
August, 2017
  • August 23, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 02, 2017: [Discovery]
  • August 02, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 02, 2017: [Response]
  • August 02, 2017: [Stipulation]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: [Request]
  • July 27, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 26, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 26, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 26, 2017: [Response]
  • July 26, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order Returning Defendant to State Custody]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 25, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 25, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 18, 2017: [Request]
  • July 18, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 17, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 17, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 17, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 17, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 17, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 17, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 17, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 17, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 14, 2017: [Arrest]
  • July 14, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 14, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 14, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.