U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50161
  • Case Name: Michael Lee Carroll and Rebecca Jean Carroll
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 25, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • June 23, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Closing Case]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
  • May 12, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 10, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Debtor(s)]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 13, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Filing of Certification and Request for Discharge]
  • April 13, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Debtor's Certification and Request for Discharge]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 14, 2022: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Trustee's Notice of Completion of Plan Payments]
August, 2020
  • August 10, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Forbearance of Secured Claim]
July, 2020
  • July 23, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • July 23, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Forbearance of Secured Claim]
May, 2020
  • May 01, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2020
  • April 29, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Striking Document]
  • April 29, 2020: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Forbearance of Secured Claim]
October, 2019
  • October 01, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
September, 2019
  • September 25, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Application 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • September 23, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation 1,000 or Less (Without Notice)]
  • September 05, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
August, 2019
  • August 21, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of No Objection (Text Entry)]
July, 2019
  • July 31, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Motion/Application (Sets Objection Deadline Only)]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Limit Notice]
  • July 29, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of No Objection (Text Entry)]
  • July 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Limit Notice]
  • July 28, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modify Confirmed Plan]
  • July 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • July 18, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes and ORDER (Text Order)]
  • July 16, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Set Hearing/Deadlines]
  • July 15, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • July 14, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
June, 2019
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • June 27, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • June 20, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
May, 2019
  • May 08, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Change of Address (Debtor Only) (Text Entry)]
  • May 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
April, 2019
  • April 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Response]
  • April 19, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case for Failure to Make Plan Payments]
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver) (fee required)]
  • March 07, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
  • March 06, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 23, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • January 04, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Compensation]
  • November 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - Hrng Held (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan as Confirmed]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Proposed Plan as Confirmed]
  • November 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certification About a Financial Management Course - Form 423]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
October, 2017
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel Trustee and Relief from Automatic Stay]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Order Request]
September, 2017
  • September 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 13, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Reschedule Hearing (Text Order)]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Motion to Reschedule Hearing]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Abandonment, Compel and Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
August, 2017
  • August 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
  • August 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Clerk's Certificate of Service (Text Entry)]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
  • July 16, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 15, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition Chapter 13 case upload]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.