U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50162
  • Case Name: Kristi Dawn Halverson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
October, 2017
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
  • October 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 04, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Nonstandard Order]
September, 2017
  • September 14, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Show Cause]
August, 2017
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 09, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Vacate Order]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Vacate Order]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Vacate Order (No Notice Required)]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedule E/F]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Schedule G]
July, 2017
  • July 29, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Statements - Monthly Income (122A-1)/Exemption Presumption of Abuse (122A-1Supp)]
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Statement of Social Security Number]
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - dismissed or converted, no funds]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Dismissing Case]
  • July 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • July 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • July 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Set Deadlines]
  • July 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • July 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Add Trustee]
  • July 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • July 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Update Deadline(s) Public Event]
  • July 17, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Allred, Forrest C. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.