U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50104-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Janis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 19, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 12, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 11, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 09, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • August 08, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 08, 2022: [Detention Hearing]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • April 28, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • April 27, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • April 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 21, 2021: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • April 21, 2021: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • April 21, 2021: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • April 21, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 15, 2021: [Amended Petition to Revoke (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • April 15, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
March, 2021
  • March 11, 2021: [Notice of Destruction of Exhibits]
January, 2021
  • January 28, 2021: [Order re Exhibits]
August, 2020
  • August 28, 2020: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • August 28, 2020: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • August 27, 2020: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
  • August 26, 2020: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • August 20, 2020: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • August 19, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • August 19, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 19, 2020: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • August 19, 2020: [Consent]
  • August 19, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 19, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • August 19, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • August 19, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
July, 2019
  • July 18, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 19, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 12, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • June 03, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2019
  • May 31, 2019: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 31, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 31, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 31, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 31, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 31, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 30, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
January, 2019
  • January 31, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • January 02, 2019: [Statement of Reasons]
December, 2018
  • December 21, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • December 21, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • December 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 13, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • December 13, 2018: [Sealed Allocution Statement]
November, 2018
  • November 21, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 16, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2018
  • September 21, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 19, 2018: [Verdict (Redacted)]
  • September 19, 2018: [Verdict]
  • September 19, 2018: [Redacted Document]
  • September 19, 2018: [Jury Question]
  • September 19, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 19, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • September 19, 2018: [Jury Trial - Completed]
  • September 18, 2018: [Jury Instructions]
  • September 18, 2018: [Jury Trial - Began]
  • September 18, 2018: [Jury List]
  • September 17, 2018: [Pretrial Conference]
  • September 17, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 17, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 13, 2018: [In Limine]
  • September 13, 2018: [Supplement]
  • September 13, 2018: [Proposed Jury Instructions]
  • September 13, 2018: [Notice]
  • September 11, 2018: [Response to Motion]
  • September 11, 2018: [Notice]
  • September 07, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 06, 2018: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
  • September 05, 2018: [Text Order re Personal Appearance Waiver]
  • September 05, 2018: [Indictment / Information - Superseding - Redacted]
  • September 05, 2018: [Indictment - Superseding]
  • September 04, 2018: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 04, 2018: [In Limine]
August, 2018
  • August 13, 2018: [Notice]
  • August 10, 2018: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 09, 2018: [Order Reassigning Case]
  • August 08, 2018: [Objection]
  • August 07, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 06, 2018: [Evidentiary Hearing]
  • August 06, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 03, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 03, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • August 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • August 02, 2018: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • August 01, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2018
  • July 31, 2018: [Warrant Returned Executed]
February, 2018
  • February 28, 2018: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2017
  • December 29, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Ex Parte Motion for Revocation]
  • December 22, 2017: [Consent]
  • December 22, 2017: [Bond Revocation Hearing]
  • December 22, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2017: [Arrest]
  • December 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 17, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 03, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 20, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
  • October 04, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 11, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 01, 2017: [Summons Returned Executed]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 31, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 31, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 31, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 30, 2017: [Request]
  • August 30, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 30, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • August 30, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 30, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 30, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 30, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 30, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 30, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • August 07, 2017: [Summons Issued]
July, 2017
  • July 18, 2017: [Summons Issued]
  • July 18, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 18, 2017: [Indictment]
  • July 18, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.