U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50106-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tobacco
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Attorney (attorney use)]
  • January 05, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • January 04, 2022: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • January 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • January 04, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • January 04, 2022: [Consent]
February, 2021
  • February 01, 2021: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2021
  • January 29, 2021: [Consent]
  • January 29, 2021: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • January 22, 2021: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2021: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
December, 2020
  • December 09, 2020: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 09, 2020: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • December 09, 2020: [Order of Detention]
  • December 09, 2020: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • December 09, 2020: [Detention Hearing]
  • December 08, 2020: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • December 08, 2020: [Consent]
  • December 08, 2020: [Waiver of Personal Appearance]
December, 2019
  • December 31, 2019: [Text Order]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Petition to Revoke]
  • December 30, 2019: [Order on Request to Dismiss Petition to Revoke]
July, 2019
  • July 15, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • July 12, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • July 03, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2019
  • May 22, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 17, 2019: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • May 17, 2019: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 17, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • May 17, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 17, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 17, 2019: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 16, 2019: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
March, 2019
  • March 29, 2019: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 29, 2019: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2018
  • June 04, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 04, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
May, 2018
  • May 31, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • May 30, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • May 14, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • May 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • May 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
April, 2018
  • April 26, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • April 17, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 12, 2018: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 02, 2018: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • March 02, 2018: [Consent]
  • March 02, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
February, 2018
  • February 14, 2018: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • February 14, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • February 14, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
  • February 14, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
January, 2018
  • January 31, 2018: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • January 31, 2018: [Motion Hearing]
  • January 31, 2018: [Addendum to Bail Report]
  • January 30, 2018: [Furlough]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • December 27, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 22, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 02, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
October, 2017
  • October 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • October 10, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • October 05, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 29, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 16, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
July, 2017
  • July 20, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 19, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 19, 2017: [Request]
  • July 19, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 19, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 19, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 19, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 19, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 19, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 18, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 18, 2017: [Arrest]
  • July 18, 2017: [Warrant Issued]
  • July 18, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 18, 2017: [Indictment]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.