U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30098-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bad Warrior
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 21, 2022: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • June 21, 2022: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • June 14, 2022: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Text Order]
  • May 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 04, 2022: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • May 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • May 04, 2022: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • May 04, 2022: [Text Order for Preliminary Hearing & Detention Hearing]
  • May 02, 2022: [Text Order for Revocation Discovery]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
July, 2018
  • July 02, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
June, 2018
  • June 11, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • June 11, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • June 11, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • June 04, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • June 04, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • June 04, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
May, 2018
  • May 22, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • May 09, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
March, 2018
  • March 20, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 20, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • March 12, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 07, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • March 07, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • March 07, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
February, 2018
  • February 15, 2018: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • February 12, 2018: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • February 01, 2018: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
December, 2017
  • December 01, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
November, 2017
  • November 28, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • November 28, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 28, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 28, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • November 27, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 27, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
September, 2017
  • September 25, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 19, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 19, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
July, 2017
  • July 26, 2017: [Order]
  • July 26, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 25, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 24, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 24, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 24, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 24, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 24, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 24, 2017: [Arrest]
  • July 24, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 24, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 24, 2017: [Request]
  • July 24, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 24, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 18, 2017: [Indictment]
  • July 18, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.