U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:17-cr-30097-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Noisy Hawk
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
January, 2018
  • January 10, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 05, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • January 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
December, 2017
  • December 05, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • December 05, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • December 05, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 05, 2017: [Continue]
November, 2017
  • November 22, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • November 13, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • November 07, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • September 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • September 25, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Request]
  • July 31, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 27, 2017: [Order]
  • July 26, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 26, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Unexecuted]
  • July 26, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 26, 2017: [Arrest]
  • July 26, 2017: [Stipulation]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 25, 2017: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 25, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 25, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 25, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 25, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 25, 2017: [Request]
  • July 25, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 21, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 18, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Redacted]
  • July 18, 2017: [Indictment]
  • July 18, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.