U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Andrews
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 27, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
  • November 26, 2019: [Revocation of Supervised Release - Final Hearing]
  • November 25, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
  • November 08, 2019: [Warrant Returned Pursuant to WHCAP]
  • November 08, 2019: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • November 07, 2019: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 07, 2019: [Text Order Appointing Attorney]
  • November 07, 2019: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 07, 2019: [Arraignment]
  • November 07, 2019: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 07, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 07, 2019: [Order of Detention]
  • November 01, 2019: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
February, 2018
  • February 27, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
January, 2018
  • January 16, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • January 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • January 11, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • January 04, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 04, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 04, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 04, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 27, 2017: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • December 07, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 27, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 13, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 13, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
September, 2017
  • September 27, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 27, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 27, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 27, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 07, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • September 01, 2017: [Informed Consent to Continuance]
  • September 01, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
July, 2017
  • July 21, 2017: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • July 21, 2017: [Request]
  • July 21, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 20, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 20, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2017: [Arrest]
  • July 19, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.