U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:17-cr-50103-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yellow Horse
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2019
  • February 01, 2019: [Judgment on Revocation]
January, 2019
  • January 30, 2019: [Revocation of Probation - Final Hearing]
  • January 23, 2019: [Final Supplemental Presentence Report]
November, 2018
  • November 29, 2018: [Text Scheduling Order]
  • November 28, 2018: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 26, 2018: [Warrant on Revocation Returned Executed]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2018: [Waiver of Preliminary Hearing]
  • November 21, 2018: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • November 21, 2018: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 21, 2018: [Revocation Proceedings - Initial Appearance]
  • November 21, 2018: [Detention Hearing]
  • November 20, 2018: [Arrest - On REVOCATION]
February, 2018
  • February 26, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 26, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 15, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 08, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 08, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • February 08, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
December, 2017
  • December 20, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 11, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • December 07, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
October, 2017
  • October 18, 2017: [Order on Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2017: [Report and Recommendations on Guilty Plea]
  • October 06, 2017: [Consent]
  • October 06, 2017: [Indictment / Information - Amended]
  • October 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 05, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor - Superseding]
  • October 03, 2017: [Text Order]
September, 2017
  • September 21, 2017: [Order Referring Change of Plea to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 21, 2017: [Order on Sealed Motion]
  • September 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • September 21, 2017: [Sealed Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • September 19, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • September 19, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • September 18, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • September 15, 2017: [Terminate Hearings]
  • September 11, 2017: [Stipulation and Order re Discovery]
  • September 08, 2017: [Joint Notice of Speedy Trial Calculation]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • July 26, 2017: [Request]
  • July 26, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 21, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • July 21, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 21, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • July 21, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 21, 2017: [Invocation of Rights]
  • July 21, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 21, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • July 21, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 21, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 19, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 19, 2017: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 19, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.