U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40065-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reta-Castillo et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2019
  • November 13, 2019: [Notice of Expiration of Probation]
January, 2018
  • January 25, 2018: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • January 18, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • January 18, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • January 03, 2018: [Forfeiture]
  • January 03, 2018: [Declaration of Publication]
November, 2017
  • November 14, 2017: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • November 13, 2017: [Sentencing]
  • November 13, 2017: [Letter(s) of Support]
  • November 09, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 30, 2017: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • October 30, 2017: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • October 30, 2017: [Final Presentence Report]
  • October 30, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 30, 2017: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • October 27, 2017: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • October 24, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • October 24, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
September, 2017
  • September 26, 2017: [Set/Reset PSR Deadlines]
  • September 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 25, 2017: [Continue]
  • September 05, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
August, 2017
  • August 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture]
  • August 09, 2017: [Forfeiture]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 31, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 31, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • July 31, 2017: [Order on Oral Motion]
  • July 31, 2017: [Oral Motion (COURT USE ONLY)]
  • July 27, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • July 24, 2017: [Order of Recusal]
  • July 21, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • July 21, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • July 21, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • July 21, 2017: [Notice Regarding Cooperator Information]
  • July 21, 2017: [Information - Misdemeanor]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.