U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50178
  • Case Name: Leon Charles Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
July, 2017
  • July 27, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Dismissal]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Dismissing Case]
  • July 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • July 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 22, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.