U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-40329
  • Case Name: A & J Farms, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2018
  • April 03, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Close Bankruptcy Case Administratively]
March, 2018
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Discharging Trustee Following Dismissal (Text Order)]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Trustee's Final Report Following Dismissal]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Withdrawal of Document (Text Entry)]
  • March 19, 2018: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 12 Trustee's Final Report and Account]
December, 2017
  • December 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Dismissal]
  • December 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Dismiss Case]
November, 2017
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan/Modified Plan]
  • November 30, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • November 27, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Relief from Automatic Stay (fee required)]
  • November 16, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 14, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Time]
October, 2017
  • October 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Time]
  • October 22, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • October 20, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (Text Order)]
  • October 13, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • October 12, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Extend Deadline to File Plan, Schedules and/or Statements (No Notice)]
September, 2017
  • September 07, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
August, 2017
  • August 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion]
  • August 29, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Nonstandard Motion (PRIOR COURT APPROVAL REQUIRED)]
  • August 28, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • August 10, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney (Text Order)]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule H]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule G]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule E/F]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule D]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule A/B]
  • August 04, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employment of Attorney]
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice]
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 12]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice Appointing Trustee]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Corporate Ownership]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 4 Chapter: 12 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 12)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.