U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 17-50180
  • Case Name: Leon Charles Gonzalez
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Case Reassigned]
February, 2021
  • February 19, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • February 19, 2021: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (with waiver of notice) (fee required)]
December, 2019
  • December 13, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
April, 2019
  • April 03, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
March, 2019
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Auto-Docket of Internet Payment]
  • March 30, 2019: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Transfer/Assignment of Claim (no waiver) (fee required)]
September, 2018
  • September 20, 2018: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Change of Address]
November, 2017
  • November 23, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Document Sent to BNC for Service]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • November 21, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Confirming Plan - No Hrng (Text Order) Ch 12/13]
  • November 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • November 06, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Show Cause]
October, 2017
  • October 19, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Hearing Minutes (New)]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Hearing (For Confirmations, Obj to Claims and Withdraw as Atty (LBR 2091-1(b)) ONLY)]
  • October 18, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Modified Plan]
September, 2017
  • September 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • September 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Deficiency Financial Management Course]
  • September 12, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Conclusion - Ch 13 Ch 7]
  • September 11, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Objection to Confirmation of Plan]
August, 2017
  • August 08, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Service]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Plan]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income Form 122C-2]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Chapter 13 Statement of Current Monthly Income and Calculation of Commitment Period Form 122C-1]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Employee Income Records]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Statement of Financial Affairs]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule J]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule I]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule H]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule G]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule E/F]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule D]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule C]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Schedule A/B]
  • August 07, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Declaration About Individual Debtors Schedules]
  • August 02, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Receipt of Filing Fee]
  • July 28, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments]
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 13]
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Corrective Entry]
  • July 26, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Meeting of Creditors Chapter 7 No Asset]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Certificate of Credit Counseling]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Limited Filers only)]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Add Trustee]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • July 25, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Wein, Dale A. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
  • July 24, 2017: bk Office: 5 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.