U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of South Dakota

south dakota Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of South Dakota
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:17-cr-40061-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Berry et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 13, 2025: [Notice of Expiration of Supervised Release]
January, 2022
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 13, 2022: [Request to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2019
  • October 31, 2019: [Appeal Record Returned]
September, 2019
  • September 04, 2019: [USCA Mandate]
July, 2019
  • July 22, 2019: [USCA Judgment]
  • July 22, 2019: [USCA Opinion]
  • July 11, 2019: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
June, 2019
  • June 19, 2019: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 18, 2019: [Response]
  • June 11, 2019: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • June 10, 2019: [Extend]
  • June 04, 2019: [Text Order]
May, 2019
  • May 13, 2019: [Discovery]
August, 2018
  • August 03, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
July, 2018
  • July 16, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • July 16, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • July 16, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • July 11, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 11, 2018: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 11, 2018: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • July 10, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • July 09, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • July 09, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • July 09, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
June, 2018
  • June 25, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 25, 2018: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • June 24, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • June 05, 2018: [Appeal Record sent to USCA]
  • June 04, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • June 04, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • June 04, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • June 04, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 04, 2018: [Continue]
May, 2018
  • May 29, 2018: [USCA Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Transcript]
  • May 18, 2018: [Notice of Filing of Public Transcript for Redaction Purposes]
  • May 18, 2018: [Transcript - Public]
  • May 18, 2018: [Transcript - Restricted]
  • May 07, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 07, 2018: [USCA Case Number and Briefing Schedule]
  • May 03, 2018: [Transmittal of Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit COA]
  • May 03, 2018: [Court Reporter Information]
  • May 03, 2018: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
April, 2018
  • April 30, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • April 24, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • April 24, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 23, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • April 20, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 19, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 10, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 09, 2018: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • April 09, 2018: [Continue]
  • April 02, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • April 02, 2018: [Exhibit List]
  • April 02, 2018: [Sentencing]
March, 2018
  • March 29, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • March 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 05, 2018: [Continue]
February, 2018
  • February 23, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 22, 2018: [Continue]
  • February 22, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 22, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • February 22, 2018: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • February 16, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • February 15, 2018: [CJA 20 - Authorization to Pay]
  • February 15, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 05, 2018: [Statement of Reasons]
  • February 05, 2018: [Judgment and Commitment]
  • February 05, 2018: [Sentencing]
  • February 01, 2018: [Status Conference]
January, 2018
  • January 29, 2018: [Sealed Letter(s) of Support]
  • January 26, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 24, 2018: [Recommended Special Conditions]
  • January 24, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 24, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 19, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 19, 2018: [Status Conference]
  • January 17, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 16, 2018: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 15, 2018: [Continue]
  • January 14, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 14, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2018: [Final Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2018: [Addendum to Final Presentence Report]
  • January 12, 2018: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • January 08, 2018: [Notice of No Objections to Presentence Report]
  • January 08, 2018: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 05, 2018: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • January 05, 2018: [Extend]
  • January 04, 2018: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • January 04, 2018: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • January 04, 2018: [Plea Agreement]
December, 2017
  • December 28, 2017: [Sealed Objections to Presentence Report (PSR)]
  • December 26, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
  • December 26, 2017: [Order on Motion to Extend]
  • December 26, 2017: [Extend]
  • December 22, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • December 21, 2017: [Continue]
  • December 21, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 12, 2017: [Draft Presentence Report]
November, 2017
  • November 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • November 14, 2017: [Continue]
  • November 06, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 06, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
October, 2017
  • October 26, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 24, 2017: [Statement of Factual Basis]
  • October 24, 2017: [Sealed Plea Agreement Supplement]
  • October 24, 2017: [Plea Agreement]
  • October 16, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 16, 2017: [Change of Plea Hearing]
  • October 11, 2017: [Scheduling Order]
  • October 11, 2017: [Petition to Plead Guilty]
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: [Order on Motion for Continuance 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2017: [Consent]
  • August 15, 2017: [Continuance Motion under 18:3161]
  • August 15, 2017: [Extend]
  • August 15, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 14, 2017: [Discovery]
  • August 14, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 09, 2017: [Response]
  • August 08, 2017: [Discovery]
  • August 08, 2017: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 07, 2017: [Discovery]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Filing Error]
  • August 04, 2017: [Request]
  • August 04, 2017: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • August 02, 2017: [Warrant Returned Unexecuted]
  • August 02, 2017: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
  • August 02, 2017: [Response]
  • August 01, 2017: [Scheduling and Case Management Order]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order of Detention]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order Appointing CJA Attorney]
  • August 01, 2017: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 01, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • August 01, 2017: [Arraignment]
  • August 01, 2017: [Initial Appearance]
  • August 01, 2017: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 01, 2017: [Bail Report]
July, 2017
  • July 31, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 31, 2017: [Response]
  • July 28, 2017: [Notice]
  • July 28, 2017: [Request]
  • July 28, 2017: [Financial Affidavit - CJA23]
  • July 28, 2017: [Bail Report]
  • July 27, 2017: [Request]
  • July 26, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 25, 2017: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 25, 2017: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • July 25, 2017: [Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum]
  • July 25, 2017: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 25, 2017: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.